SPRINGFIELD ADVICE AND LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1003145
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £349.27k £284.69k £286.58k £187.00k £158.02k
Total expenditure £292.11k £207.61k £190.25k £195.00k £226.50k
Income from government contracts £223.81k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £125.02k £62.44k £53.77k £54.00k £90.67k