TOYOTA-SHI TREVELYAN TRUST

Charity number: 1003181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £8.36k £8.93k £10.30k £15.40k £8.59k
Total expenditure £7.49k £22.13k £20.48k £19.72k £29.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A