ABO TRUST

Charity number: 1003852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time Download