ABO TRUST

Charity number: 1003852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.25k £223.65k £30.75k £22.84k £24.27k
Total expenditure £27.90k £25.15k £31.92k £40.79k £41.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A