Financial history PERCY LEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1004097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £10.92k £5.67k £4.56k £3.00k £4.77k
Total expenditure £14.37k £2.42k £12.50k £1.50k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A