Financial history FELIXSTOWE OPPORTUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1004101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.04k £12.94k £17.71k £8.03k £12.29k
Total expenditure £11.33k £12.28k £18.53k £8.69k £6.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.25k £9.68k N/A £11.90k