MERTON MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1004122
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 November 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 November 2020 125 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 02 May 2017 On time Download