MERTON MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1004122
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £1.06m £1.09m £1.18m £1.11m £1.33m
Total expenditure £1.07m £1.09m £1.16m £1.10m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.00k £316.77k £299.76k £299.64k £282.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £17.27k £376.54k £18.72k £5.15k £26.24k
Income - Other trading activities £325.26k £0 £0 £1.10m £0
Income - Charitable activities £719.00k £709.05k £1.16m £0 £1.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £59 £87 £15 £31 £39
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.09m £1.16m £10.62k £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £61.36k £59.64k £60.10k £10.62k £52.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.09m £0