Trustees MERTON MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1004122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sebastian Jones Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Manish Solanki Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Mia Liyanage Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Kingsley Green Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Nikki Morgan Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Sandra Kay Vogel Trustee 11 March 2019
MITCHAM CRICKET GREEN COMMUNITY & HERITAGE
Received: On time
Emma Trevelyan Trustee 24 September 2018
FRIENDS OF MERTON'S YOUNG MUSICIANS
Overdue by 13 days
Ian Bond Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Rowena Louise Maybury Trustee 08 February 2016
None on record
Edward Andrew John Hickman Trustee 21 October 2014
None on record