ATHLETICS FOR THE YOUNG

Charity number: 1004448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £107 £127 £7.11k £7.52k £5.16k
Total expenditure £23.55k £20.73k £24.62k £17.39k £13.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A