Accounts and annual returns AVOCET TRUST

Charity number: 1004537
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 July 2021 177 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window