Financial history SOUTH ASIAN DEVELOPMENT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1005384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.01k £1.77k £16 £8 £1
Total expenditure £11.14k £9.09k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A