Financial history THE YOUNG EXPLORERS' TRUST

Charity number: 1006211
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £15.74k £11.41k £13.13k £18.20k £13.60k
Total expenditure £11.75k £11.32k £10.71k £4.58k £4.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A