FOLKESTONE PARKS AND PLEASURE GROUNDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1006288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 July 2018 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 July 2018 155 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 February 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 February 2017 9 days late Download