FOLKESTONE PARKS AND PLEASURE GROUNDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1006288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £539.55k £931.00k £661.00k £754.00k £715.00k
Total expenditure £598.89k £690.00k £643.00k £732.00k £737.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £448.21k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £273.00k £554.00k £581.00k £543.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £51.86k £60.00k £60.00k £91.00k £100.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.48k £38.00k £47.00k £82.00k £72.00k
Income - Other £448.21k £560.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £598.89k £690.00k £633.00k £688.00k £706.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.76k £10.00k £8.00k £11.00k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £10.00k £44.00k £31.00k