Trustees Mind in Tower Hamlets, Newham and Redbridge
Charity number: 1006927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vandana Siney | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Kyne | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant Martin | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Uwadiae | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Asif Dhanani | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Max Woolfson | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angie Shannon | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mclean | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dimitrios Goumenos | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Oldfield | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nick Aellen | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|||||
John Whitehead | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.