Trustees Research Institute for Disabled Consumers
Charity number: 1007726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PHILIP FRIEND OBE | Chair |
|
||||||||
NOMQHELE MBAMBO | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
SANDRA WITZEL | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
GREGORY SMITH | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ADELE AITCHISON | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
MR MICHAEL NICHOLSON | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
MRS CAROL CAMPBELL | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
RASHMIKANT NAVALCHAND MEHTA | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM BRIGGS | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Tracey Proudlock | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH GUBBAY | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.