Financial history CHILDREN'S LEUKAEMIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1008634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £18.00k £65.82k £45.00k £44.27k £44.00k
Total expenditure £64.00k £55.23k £35.64k £39.77k £59.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A