SUNNYSIDE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1008641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.82k £24.43k £9.54k £16.65k £17.09k
Total expenditure £7.29k £10.65k £10.13k £13.04k £19.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.31k