VERITAS COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1009018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 25 October 2016 On time Download