VERITAS COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1009018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £429.70k £716.37k £332.95k £620.18k £901.71k
Total expenditure £380.68k £464.78k £447.97k £590.48k £532.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £716.19k N/A £619.34k £900.63k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £118 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £500 £290
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £58 N/A £334 £789
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £462.39k N/A £588.10k £529.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £2.39k N/A £2.38k £2.69k