Dogfen lywodraethu BOYS' AND GIRLS' CLUBS OF WALES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/1992 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/1992 AS AMENDED ON 27/07/1998 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/2004 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE AREA THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL EDUCATION AND THE IMPROVING OF SUCH BOYS AND GIRLS
Maes buddion
WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.