AIRBORNE ENGINEERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1009201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.65k £1.89k £1.13k £4.78k £1.42k
Total expenditure £2.41k £2.28k £2.03k £1.94k £2.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A