ST CLEMENT AND ST JAMES COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1009253
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 July 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 02 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)