THE JEWISH MUSEUM LONDON

Charity number: 1009819

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Korski Trustee 27 January 2021 None on record
TANYA PERSEY Trustee 09 July 2018
ACORRN - ACTION RADIOTHERAPY Received: On time
Tal Krikler Trustee 27 May 2020 None on record
Frances Madeleine Jeens Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record
Jamie Adam Beaumont Trustee 27 May 2020 None on record
Nicholas Viner Chair 30 June 2020
THE ARCHITECTURAL ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time