ROCK OF AGES C AND S CHURCH (MOUNT OF MERCY)

Charity number: 1009853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.70k £9.60k £8.20k £3.60k £1.20k
Total expenditure £5.50k £13.00k £12.00k £4.00k £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A