ROCK OF AGES C AND S CHURCH (MOUNT OF MERCY)

Charity number: 1009853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 17 March 1992: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 14 March 2013: Re-registered
  • 09 February 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 February 2016: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROCK OF AGES C AND S CHURCH MOUNT OF MERCY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property