Dogfen lywodraethu THE BLACKPOOL FYLDE AND WYRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/12/2011 as amended on 04 Jun 2019 as amended on 16 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s Objects are: (1) The relief of blind and visually impaired people in Blackpool, Fylde and Wyre districts of Lancashire or outside of it, by the provision of accommodation, care and support services. (2) The relief of people in need by reason of age, ill-health, disability or other disadvantage in Blackpool, Fylde and Wyre districts of Lancashire or outside of it, by the provision of accommodation, care and support services. (3) For the public benefit to raise awareness of blindness and visual impairment through the provision of advice and information.
Maes buddion
BLACKPOOL,FYLDE AND WYRE DISTRICTS OF LANCS,AND AREA OUTSIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.