Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE MANCHESTER
Charity number: 1010167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverly D'Alessio | Chair | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
William Priest | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lyonette | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mitton | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Virginia Hibbert | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Megan Culpin | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Simpson | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Conor Meenan | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robinson | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Holly Markin | Trustee | 18 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiona McNair | Trustee | 18 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Clarke | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.