KINGS PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL PFA

Charity number: 1010273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 03 December 2020 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2018 03 February 2020 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2016 19 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2016 Not Required