QUINTIN HOGG TRUST

Charity number: 1010404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £4.46m £4.71m £5.79m £5.72m £6.80m
Total expenditure £1.63m £4.18m £5.44m £4.07m £5.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.19m £4.36m £5.45m £5.34m £4.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £273.88k £347.84k £337.48k £377.00k £373.39k
Income - Other £400 £400 £400 £941 £1.53m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.58m £4.11m £5.21m £3.87m £5.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.69k £64.71k £49.87k £51.39k £52.64k
Expenditure - Governance £4.21k £830.97k £11.47k £774.67k £176.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £803.45k £3.28m £4.11m £3.10m £4.85m
Expenditure - Investment management £40.69k £64.71k £49.87k £51.39k £52.64k
Expenditure - Other £613 £0 £175.18k £144.26k £26.24k