Financial history WORKING WELL TRUST

Charity number: 1011120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £798.93k £970.84k £957.10k £1.30m £1.46m
Total expenditure £845.30k £965.08k £1.05m £1.28m £1.34m
Income from government contracts £148.02k £228.35k N/A N/A £214.57k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £107.89k £110.43k £214.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.19k £3.68k £6.15k £7.58k £2.08k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.08k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £792.89k £966.08k £950.95k £0 £1.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.85k £0 £0 £1.30m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.08k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £845.30k £965.08k £1.05m £1.28m £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.35k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.34m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0