Financial history THE WILLIAM WATES MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1011213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £707.75k £705.79k £764.59k £352.00k £421.78k
Total expenditure £817.15k £987.24k £646.78k £516.50k £564.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £399.93k £366.34k £395.67k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £288.12k £317.47k £363.40k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £19.71k £21.97k £5.52k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £377.13k £553.23k £180.32k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £433.06k £434.01k £466.47k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.17k £10.88k £6.45k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £2.80k £4.43k £8.37k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A