Accounts and annual returns HUBY PLAYGROUND APPEAL

Charity number: 1011394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 March 2022 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 March 2022 505 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 March 2022 871 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 March 2021 866 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required