Financial history HUBY PLAYGROUND APPEAL

Charity number: 1011394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.72k £1.10k £266 £1.31k £1.54k
Total expenditure £5.48k £1.12k £925 £2.33k £1.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A