KATHARINE HOUSE HOSPICE

Charity number: 1011712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.37m £7.41m £8.00m £7.84m £8.34m
Total expenditure £7.48m £7.62m £7.90m £7.84m £6.92m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £3.50k £27.41k £80.56k
Income from government grants £990.29k £987.38k £1.03m £1.27m £2.92m
Income - Donations and legacies £237.90k £357.99k £537.68k £758.40k £1.50m
Income - Other trading activities £5.84m £6.04m £6.40m £5.39m £2.01m
Income - Charitable activities £1.27m £992.36k £1.03m £1.63m £3.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.28k £10.58k £13.78k £12.40k £9.43k
Income - Other £18.04k £11.60k £12.65k £54.67k £1.50m
Income - Legacies £165.86k £280.95k £499.28k £114.88k £245.81k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.40m £3.36m £3.55m £3.38m £3.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.07m £4.26m £4.34m £4.44m £3.68m
Expenditure - Governance £60.99k £61.19k £71.64k £82.24k £131.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £13.16k £8.54k £8.97k £8.73k £7.68k
Expenditure - Other £6.51k £7.87k £12.20k £20.28k £14.70k