KATHARINE HOUSE HOSPICE

Charity number: 1011712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brett Warwick James Phillips Trustee 27 October 2020 None on record
Francis Anthony Gaffney Trustee 27 October 2020 None on record
Alan Patrick Jeffries Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
STEPHANIE JOY HARRIS Trustee 22 January 2019
BELIEVE TO ACHIEVE Received: On time
Peter Robert Catchpole Trustee 27 October 2020 None on record
JENNIFER WOODYARD Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
Allison Jayne Cape Trustee 19 November 2014 None on record
JEAN-PIERRE PARSONS Chair None on record
Dr Zia Din Trustee 26 January 2021 None on record
Mark Gordon Evans Trustee 28 May 2019 None on record
Richard Glynn Moore Hughes Trustee 26 January 2021 None on record
Dr Mark Bland Trustee 24 July 2018 None on record
IAN DAVID STARKIE Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
TERRY MINGAY Trustee 19 November 2014 None on record