Dogfen lywodraethu GLOBAL POLICY LONDON LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1987 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 4 JUNE 1991 AND 28 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 FEB 2019 as amended on 05 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit from time to time, in particular but not limited to advancing the education of the public by acting as an educational institute that conducts research, offers policy advice, provides training and short courses, teaches and supervises postgraduates, and disseminates its work through lectures, seminars, public events, social media, websites and publications.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.