THE BAT CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1012361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander John Randall Trustee 10 October 2020
Thin Green Line Foundation UK Received: On time
SARACENS SPORT FOUNDATION Received: On time
UK OVERSEAS TERRITORIES CONSERVATION FORUM Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF BIRDS Received: On time
HUMAN TRAFFICKING FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr Orly Nechama Razgour Trustee 09 October 2021 None on record
Dr Abigail Entwistle Trustee 12 September 2015 None on record
Matthew William Terry Trustee 09 October 2021 None on record
Stuart Brittenden Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
RUPERT LANCASTER Trustee 05 December 2013 None on record
Helen Louise Slinger Trustee 09 October 2021 None on record
Dr Cerys Bradley Trustee 09 October 2021 None on record
Steven Roe Trustee 08 September 2018 None on record
JEAN MATTHEWS Trustee 08 September 2018 None on record
Ani Binet Trustee 18 November 2017
HAMPSHIRE BAT GROUP Received: On time
Ruth Waters Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record