THE FRIENDS OF EGERTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1012648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required