Trustees THE REGIMENTAL CHARITY OF THE ROYAL DRAGOON GUARDS
Charity number: 1012766
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Best | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
RSM Mark Foster | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Martin Morrissey MBE | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Pendry DL | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Macfarlane | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Major GRAEME GREEN | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Nick Millen | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tim Hyams | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Crispian Jeremy Cuss | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Read | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Campbell Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.