Trustees THE LEONARDO DA VINCI SOCIETY
Charity number: 1012878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Alexander John Marr | Chair | 09 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Mari Elen Wyn Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr MATTHEW Hayden LANDRUS | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Dilwyn Knox | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Jeremy Oosterhoff | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maya Corry | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Austin Talbot | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Frank James | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Francis Ashbee Ames-Lewis | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANTHONY JOHN SCOTT MANN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JULIANA BARONE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.