1ST ATTLEBOROUGH ST MARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1012900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Sturman Trustee 20 July 2018 None on record
Lindsey Harrold Trustee 28 January 2017 None on record
DAVID ECKLES Trustee 18 September 2020
THE MORLEY VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
Harriet Jane Burrell-Knipe Trustee 20 July 2018 None on record
Sally Goodrum Trustee 05 October 2017 None on record
JUDITH ECKLES Trustee 22 April 2016 None on record
Patrick Sturman Trustee 05 October 2017 None on record
Glynis Harrold Chair 31 July 2015 None on record
Glenn Harrold Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record