Trustees LYTHAM ST ANNES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1013058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Mary Wykes | Chair | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Russell | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Walley | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Adams | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Barlow | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Ripley | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Mary Dickson | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Denise Pullar | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Pollitt | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.