Trustees EMLEY SHOW SOCIETY
Charity number: 1013141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SEARBY | Chair |
|
||||||
Pamela Dyson | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES SENIOR | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELLA SENIOR | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PATERSON | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Paterson | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Julianne Shelmerdine | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hagain | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HAGAIN | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Roome | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BECKWITH | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|||||
RAYMOND WILLIAM GOTT | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Wydell | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Corol Elizabeth O'Toole | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDY GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Joseph Hampshire | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN HAMPSHIRE | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY MAE Chapple | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Susan Patricia BRITTON | Trustee | 01 September 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.