Financial history BRITISH SOCIETY OF PROSTHODONTICS

Charity number: 1013233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £160.22k £94.54k £134.06k £44.44k £45.19k
Total expenditure £207.11k £75.99k £93.60k £31.12k £31.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A