Accounts and annual returns ST NICHOLAS AT WADE PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1013544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2021 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 19 September 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required