RIVERSIDE VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1013545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £822.98k £811.23k £684.12k £858.22k £668.50k
Total expenditure £610.91k £625.36k £651.08k £739.04k £687.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £771.22k £759.06k £622.78k £764.09k £619.99k
Income - Other trading activities £25.16k £27.24k £33.90k £59.92k £35.64k
Income - Charitable activities £25.76k £24.21k £24.94k £34.10k £12.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £715 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £842 £0 £2.50k £100 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £610.91k £625.36k £651.08k £739.04k £677.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.93k
Expenditure - Governance £10.01k £10.31k £10.78k £10.96k £11.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £36.00k £29.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0