Financial history 1ST ASHCOMBE (WESTON-SUPER-MARE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1013788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £13.21k £12.96k £4.34k £14.50k £9.24k
Total expenditure £15.73k £12.16k £4.69k £10.13k £8.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A