Governing document FRIENDS OF MOUNT STREET SCHOOL
Charity number: 1013987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 25 MARCH 1992, 18 OCTOBER 1994, 10 JULY 2002 AND 4 FEBRUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENCOURAGE EDUCATION AND LIFELONG LEARNING NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.